Réponses

2014-05-18T21:57:35+02:00
a)
11/4 x 8
= 88/4
= 4 x 22 / 4 x 1
= 22/1
= 22

b)
18/25 x 5
= 90/25
= 5 x 18 / 5 x 5
= 18/5

c)
49/22 x 33
= 1617/22
= 11 x 147 / 11 x 2
= 47/2

d)
9/14 x 2,1
= 18,9/14
= 18,9 x 10 / 14 x 10
= 189/140
= 7 x 27 / 7 x 20
= 27/20

e)
23/24 x 6,6
= 151,80/24
= 151,80 x 100 / 24 x 100
= 15180/2400
= 60 x 253 / 60 x 40
= 253/40

f)
2/3 x 35,1
= 70,2/3
= 70,2 x 10 / 3 x 10
= 702/30
= 6 x 117 / 6 x 5
= 117/5