Réponses

  • Utilisateur Brainly
2014-03-18T20:34:17+01:00
H= 45/32 x20/27 x6/4x16/25
 =(45*20*6*16)/(32*27*4*25)
 =(5*3*3*5*2*2*2*3*4*4)/(4*4*2*3*3*3*2*2*5*5)
 =1
2014-03-18T20:39:07+01:00
H = 45/32 x 20/27 x 6/4 x 16/25
H = 45 x 20 x 6/4 x 16/25
       32 x 27
H = 900/864 x 6/4 x 16/25
H = 900 x 6 x 16/25
      864 x 4
H = 5400/3456 x 16/25
H = 5400 x 16
      3456 x 25
H = 86400/86400
H = 1